|
08/30/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 204, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2019
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 63. Noes 5. Page 2724.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2019
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2019
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 818.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2019
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2019
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 525.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2019
|
Set for hearing April 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2019
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|