California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB192 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-Senate Bill No. 192 CHAPTER 204 An act to repeal Sections 150 and 1550 of the Penal Code, relating to crimes. [ Approved by Governor August 30, 2019. Filed with Secretary of State August 30, 2019. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSB 192, Hertzberg. Posse comitatus.Existing law makes an able-bodied person 18 years of age or older who neglects or refuses to join the posse comitatus or power of the county, by neglecting or refusing to aid and assist, as described, in making an arrest, retaking into custody a person who has escaped from arrest or imprisonment, or preventing a breach of the peace or the commission of any criminal offense, after being lawfully required by a uniformed peace officer or a judge, guilty of a misdemeanor and subject to punishment by a fine of not less than $50 nor more than $1,000. This bill would repeal that provision and make conforming changes.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY Appropriation: NO Fiscal Committee: YES Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 150 of the Penal Code is repealed.SEC. 2. Section 1550 of the Penal Code is repealed.
1+Enrolled August 16, 2019 Passed IN Senate April 25, 2019 Passed IN Assembly August 15, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Senate Bill No. 192Introduced by Senator Hertzberg(Coauthors: Assembly Members Kamlager-Dove and Wicks)January 30, 2019 An act to repeal Sections 150 and 1550 of the Penal Code, relating to crimes. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSB 192, Hertzberg. Posse comitatus.Existing law makes an able-bodied person 18 years of age or older who neglects or refuses to join the posse comitatus or power of the county, by neglecting or refusing to aid and assist, as described, in making an arrest, retaking into custody a person who has escaped from arrest or imprisonment, or preventing a breach of the peace or the commission of any criminal offense, after being lawfully required by a uniformed peace officer or a judge, guilty of a misdemeanor and subject to punishment by a fine of not less than $50 nor more than $1,000. This bill would repeal that provision and make conforming changes.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY Appropriation: NO Fiscal Committee: YES Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 150 of the Penal Code is repealed.SEC. 2. Section 1550 of the Penal Code is repealed.
22
3- Senate Bill No. 192 CHAPTER 204 An act to repeal Sections 150 and 1550 of the Penal Code, relating to crimes. [ Approved by Governor August 30, 2019. Filed with Secretary of State August 30, 2019. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSB 192, Hertzberg. Posse comitatus.Existing law makes an able-bodied person 18 years of age or older who neglects or refuses to join the posse comitatus or power of the county, by neglecting or refusing to aid and assist, as described, in making an arrest, retaking into custody a person who has escaped from arrest or imprisonment, or preventing a breach of the peace or the commission of any criminal offense, after being lawfully required by a uniformed peace officer or a judge, guilty of a misdemeanor and subject to punishment by a fine of not less than $50 nor more than $1,000. This bill would repeal that provision and make conforming changes.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY Appropriation: NO Fiscal Committee: YES Local Program: NO
3+ Enrolled August 16, 2019 Passed IN Senate April 25, 2019 Passed IN Assembly August 15, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Senate Bill No. 192Introduced by Senator Hertzberg(Coauthors: Assembly Members Kamlager-Dove and Wicks)January 30, 2019 An act to repeal Sections 150 and 1550 of the Penal Code, relating to crimes. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSB 192, Hertzberg. Posse comitatus.Existing law makes an able-bodied person 18 years of age or older who neglects or refuses to join the posse comitatus or power of the county, by neglecting or refusing to aid and assist, as described, in making an arrest, retaking into custody a person who has escaped from arrest or imprisonment, or preventing a breach of the peace or the commission of any criminal offense, after being lawfully required by a uniformed peace officer or a judge, guilty of a misdemeanor and subject to punishment by a fine of not less than $50 nor more than $1,000. This bill would repeal that provision and make conforming changes.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY Appropriation: NO Fiscal Committee: YES Local Program: NO
44
5- Senate Bill No. 192 CHAPTER 204
5+ Enrolled August 16, 2019 Passed IN Senate April 25, 2019 Passed IN Assembly August 15, 2019
66
7- Senate Bill No. 192
7+Enrolled August 16, 2019
8+Passed IN Senate April 25, 2019
9+Passed IN Assembly August 15, 2019
810
9- CHAPTER 204
11+ CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION
12+
13+ Senate Bill
14+
15+No. 192
16+
17+Introduced by Senator Hertzberg(Coauthors: Assembly Members Kamlager-Dove and Wicks)January 30, 2019
18+
19+Introduced by Senator Hertzberg(Coauthors: Assembly Members Kamlager-Dove and Wicks)
20+January 30, 2019
1021
1122 An act to repeal Sections 150 and 1550 of the Penal Code, relating to crimes.
12-
13- [ Approved by Governor August 30, 2019. Filed with Secretary of State August 30, 2019. ]
1423
1524 LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST
1625
1726 ## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST
1827
1928 SB 192, Hertzberg. Posse comitatus.
2029
2130 Existing law makes an able-bodied person 18 years of age or older who neglects or refuses to join the posse comitatus or power of the county, by neglecting or refusing to aid and assist, as described, in making an arrest, retaking into custody a person who has escaped from arrest or imprisonment, or preventing a breach of the peace or the commission of any criminal offense, after being lawfully required by a uniformed peace officer or a judge, guilty of a misdemeanor and subject to punishment by a fine of not less than $50 nor more than $1,000. This bill would repeal that provision and make conforming changes.
2231
2332 Existing law makes an able-bodied person 18 years of age or older who neglects or refuses to join the posse comitatus or power of the county, by neglecting or refusing to aid and assist, as described, in making an arrest, retaking into custody a person who has escaped from arrest or imprisonment, or preventing a breach of the peace or the commission of any criminal offense, after being lawfully required by a uniformed peace officer or a judge, guilty of a misdemeanor and subject to punishment by a fine of not less than $50 nor more than $1,000.
2433
2534 This bill would repeal that provision and make conforming changes.
2635
2736 ## Digest Key
2837
2938 ## Bill Text
3039
3140 The people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 150 of the Penal Code is repealed.SEC. 2. Section 1550 of the Penal Code is repealed.
3241
3342 The people of the State of California do enact as follows:
3443
3544 ## The people of the State of California do enact as follows:
3645
3746 SECTION 1. Section 150 of the Penal Code is repealed.
3847
3948 SECTION 1. Section 150 of the Penal Code is repealed.
4049
4150 ### SECTION 1.
4251
4352
4453
4554 SEC. 2. Section 1550 of the Penal Code is repealed.
4655
4756 SEC. 2. Section 1550 of the Penal Code is repealed.
4857
4958 ### SEC. 2.