|
10/02/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 470, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
10/02/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/18/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2019
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2831.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2019
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3189.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2019
|
August 21 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1197.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 1092.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2019
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2019
|
April 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2019
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 549.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2019
|
Set for hearing April 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 384.) (March 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2019
|
Set for hearing March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2019
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|