California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB205 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 4, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 13, 2019

Chaptered

Bill October 2, 2019

Amended

Bill August 12, 2019
Bill July 1, 2019
Bill May 17, 2019
Bill March 21, 2019