|
01/13/2020
|
Veto sustained.
|
|
|
|
01/13/2020
|
Stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/12/2019
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/12/2019
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/20/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2019
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 2960.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2019
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 50. Noes 17. Page 3581.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2019
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2019
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2019
|
August 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/10/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (July 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 6. Page 1183.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 1093.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2019
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2019
|
May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2019
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 797.) (April 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2019
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2019
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2019
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|