California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB218 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 6, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 17, 2019

Amended

Bill September 6, 2019
Bill September 3, 2019
Bill July 10, 2019
Bill April 25, 2019
Bill April 9, 2019