|
10/10/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 721, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2019
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 2500.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2019
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 58. Noes 13. Page 2964.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (August 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 819.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2019
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2019
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 653.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2019
|
Set for hearing April 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 466.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2019
|
Set for hearing March 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2019
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|