California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB229 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 7, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 6, 2019

Chaptered

Bill October 10, 2019

Amended

Bill August 12, 2019
Bill March 18, 2019