|
01/13/2020
|
Veto sustained.
|
|
|
|
01/13/2020
|
Stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2019
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2019
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2019
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2530.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2019
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2962.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2019
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2019
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2019
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2019
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read a third time, passed, and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2019
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2019
|
Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2019
|
Ordered to unfinished business.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2019
|
From special consent calendar on motion of Senator Dodd.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2234.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 4).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2019
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2019
|
Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 559.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 384.) (March 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2019
|
Set for hearing March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2019
|
Referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2019
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|