California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB232 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 7, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 6, 2019

Amended

Bill August 22, 2019
Bill May 30, 2019
Bill March 25, 2019