Assembly
|
08/30/2019
|
August 30 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2019
|
August 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2019
|
Re-referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and A. & A.R. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on A. & A.R. and HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1197.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1093.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2019
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2019
|
April 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0. Page 619.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2019
|
Set for hearing April 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2019
|
March 26 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2019
|
Set for hearing March 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2019
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2019
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|