|
10/11/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 740, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/20/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/13/2019
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 11. Page 2939.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/13/2019
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 55. Noes 19. Page 3536.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2019
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2019
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2019
|
August 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (June 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 1166.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1087.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2019
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2019
|
May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2019
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 795.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2019
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 576.) (April 3).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2019
|
Set for hearing April 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/04/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/03/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|