California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB24 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 3, 2018

Enrolled

Bill September 17, 2019

Chaptered

Bill October 11, 2019

Amended

Bill September 6, 2019
Bill June 13, 2019
Bill April 8, 2019