|
10/02/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 406, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
10/02/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/18/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2019
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2833.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2019
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3199.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2019
|
August 21 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/10/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on U. & E. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1183.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1093.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2019
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2019
|
May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2019
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 777.) (April 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on N.R. & W. (Ayes 11. Noes 1. Page 650.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2019
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2019
|
Re-referred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2019
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2019
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|