California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB247 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 11, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 13, 2019

Chaptered

Bill October 2, 2019

Amended

Bill September 3, 2019
Bill August 12, 2019
Bill July 11, 2019
Bill July 2, 2019
Bill June 12, 2019
Bill April 29, 2019
Bill March 14, 2019