|
10/12/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 845, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
10/12/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/18/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2019
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 2. Page 2842.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2019
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 3263.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2019
|
August 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2019
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 3. Page 1183.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1094.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2019
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2019
|
April 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2019
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 576.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2019
|
Set for hearing April 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2019
|
March 20 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2019
|
Set for hearing March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2019
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|