California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB260 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 13, 2019

Chaptered

Bill October 12, 2019

Amended

Bill August 12, 2019
Bill June 18, 2019
Bill March 26, 2019
Bill March 19, 2019