|
09/05/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 246, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
09/05/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2019
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2243.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2019
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2019
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2728.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/10/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/10/2019
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2019
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1009.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2019
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2019
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 801.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2019
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2019
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2019
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|