California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB271 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2019

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2019

Chaptered

Bill September 5, 2019

Amended

Bill June 20, 2019
Bill March 25, 2019