|
10/03/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 504, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
10/03/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2019
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2501.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2019
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2951.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2019
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2019
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/10/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2019
|
Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 5. Page 1027.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 905.) (April 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2019
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2019
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2019
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|