California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB274 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 6, 2019

Chaptered

Bill October 3, 2019

Amended

Bill August 19, 2019
Bill July 9, 2019
Bill June 25, 2019
Bill May 7, 2019