|
09/09/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 278, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2019
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 2472.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2019
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 48. Noes 19. Page 2970.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2019
|
Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 15. Page 2970.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/10/2019
|
July 10 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (June 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2019
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 10. Page 1208.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1094.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2019
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2019
|
May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2019
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 848.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2019
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2019
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2019
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|