California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB276 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 6, 2019

Chaptered

Bill September 9, 2019

Amended

Bill July 1, 2019
Bill June 17, 2019
Bill May 17, 2019
Bill April 30, 2019
Bill April 9, 2019
Bill March 25, 2019