|
10/08/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 640, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/18/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2019
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2866.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2019
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2019
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3266.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2019
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2019
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2019
|
August 21 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2019
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on AGING & L.T.C. and H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1273.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1094.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2019
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2019
|
May 6 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2019
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 774.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2019
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HOUSING. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 437.) (March 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2019
|
Set for hearing March 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and HOUSING.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2019
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|