California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB280 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 13, 2019

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2019

Amended

Bill September 6, 2019
Bill June 13, 2019
Bill April 10, 2019
Bill March 27, 2019