Assembly | 06/06/2019 | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2019 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2019 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 5. Page 1264.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2019 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/17/2019 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 05/17/2019 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 1095.) (May 16). | ||
Senate | 05/10/2019 | Set for hearing May 16. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2019 | April 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2019 | Set for hearing April 22. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2019 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2019 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 464.) (March 27). | ||
Senate | 03/19/2019 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 03/07/2019 | Set for hearing March 27. | ||
Senate | 02/28/2019 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2019 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2019 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |