07/01/2019 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 56, Statutes of 2019. | |||
07/01/2019 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Senate | 06/28/2019 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m. | ||
Senate | 06/24/2019 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 06/24/2019 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2402.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/19/2019 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Assembly | 06/18/2019 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 18). | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2019 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2019 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2019 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 563.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 03/27/2019 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 438.) (March 26). | ||
Senate | 03/21/2019 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 03/08/2019 | Set for hearing March 26. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2019 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2019 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |