California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB308 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-Senate Bill No. 308 CHAPTER 56 An act to amend Section 45 of the Probate Code, relating to estates and trusts. [ Approved by Governor July 01, 2019. Filed with Secretary of State July 01, 2019. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSB 308, Jones. Estates and trusts: instrument.Existing law defines instrument for purposes of the Probate Code to mean a will, trust, deed, or other writing that designates a beneficiary or makes a donative transfer of property. Existing law, the Trust Law, regulates the creation, modification, and termination of trusts and the administration of trusts by trustees on behalf of beneficiaries.This bill would revise the definition of instrument under the Probate Code to mean a will, a document establishing or modifying a trust, a deed, or any other writing that designates a beneficiary or makes a donative transfer of property.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY Appropriation: NO Fiscal Committee: NO Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 45 of the Probate Code is amended to read:45. Instrument means a will, a document establishing or modifying a trust, a deed, or any other writing that designates a beneficiary or makes a donative transfer of property.
1+Enrolled June 26, 2019 Passed IN Senate April 04, 2019 Passed IN Assembly June 24, 2019 Amended IN Senate March 21, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Senate Bill No. 308Introduced by Senator JonesFebruary 15, 2019 An act to amend Section 45 of the Probate Code, relating to estates and trusts. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSB 308, Jones. Estates and trusts: instrument.Existing law defines instrument for purposes of the Probate Code to mean a will, trust, deed, or other writing that designates a beneficiary or makes a donative transfer of property. Existing law, the Trust Law, regulates the creation, modification, and termination of trusts and the administration of trusts by trustees on behalf of beneficiaries.This bill would revise the definition of instrument under the Probate Code to mean a will, a document establishing or modifying a trust, a deed, or any other writing that designates a beneficiary or makes a donative transfer of property.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY Appropriation: NO Fiscal Committee: NO Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 45 of the Probate Code is amended to read:45. Instrument means a will, a document establishing or modifying a trust, a deed, or any other writing that designates a beneficiary or makes a donative transfer of property.
22
3- Senate Bill No. 308 CHAPTER 56 An act to amend Section 45 of the Probate Code, relating to estates and trusts. [ Approved by Governor July 01, 2019. Filed with Secretary of State July 01, 2019. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSB 308, Jones. Estates and trusts: instrument.Existing law defines instrument for purposes of the Probate Code to mean a will, trust, deed, or other writing that designates a beneficiary or makes a donative transfer of property. Existing law, the Trust Law, regulates the creation, modification, and termination of trusts and the administration of trusts by trustees on behalf of beneficiaries.This bill would revise the definition of instrument under the Probate Code to mean a will, a document establishing or modifying a trust, a deed, or any other writing that designates a beneficiary or makes a donative transfer of property.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY Appropriation: NO Fiscal Committee: NO Local Program: NO
3+ Enrolled June 26, 2019 Passed IN Senate April 04, 2019 Passed IN Assembly June 24, 2019 Amended IN Senate March 21, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Senate Bill No. 308Introduced by Senator JonesFebruary 15, 2019 An act to amend Section 45 of the Probate Code, relating to estates and trusts. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTSB 308, Jones. Estates and trusts: instrument.Existing law defines instrument for purposes of the Probate Code to mean a will, trust, deed, or other writing that designates a beneficiary or makes a donative transfer of property. Existing law, the Trust Law, regulates the creation, modification, and termination of trusts and the administration of trusts by trustees on behalf of beneficiaries.This bill would revise the definition of instrument under the Probate Code to mean a will, a document establishing or modifying a trust, a deed, or any other writing that designates a beneficiary or makes a donative transfer of property.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY Appropriation: NO Fiscal Committee: NO Local Program: NO
44
5- Senate Bill No. 308 CHAPTER 56
5+ Enrolled June 26, 2019 Passed IN Senate April 04, 2019 Passed IN Assembly June 24, 2019 Amended IN Senate March 21, 2019
6+
7+Enrolled June 26, 2019
8+Passed IN Senate April 04, 2019
9+Passed IN Assembly June 24, 2019
10+Amended IN Senate March 21, 2019
11+
12+ CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION
613
714 Senate Bill No. 308
815
9- CHAPTER 56
16+Introduced by Senator JonesFebruary 15, 2019
17+
18+Introduced by Senator Jones
19+February 15, 2019
1020
1121 An act to amend Section 45 of the Probate Code, relating to estates and trusts.
12-
13- [ Approved by Governor July 01, 2019. Filed with Secretary of State July 01, 2019. ]
1422
1523 LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST
1624
1725 ## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST
1826
1927 SB 308, Jones. Estates and trusts: instrument.
2028
2129 Existing law defines instrument for purposes of the Probate Code to mean a will, trust, deed, or other writing that designates a beneficiary or makes a donative transfer of property. Existing law, the Trust Law, regulates the creation, modification, and termination of trusts and the administration of trusts by trustees on behalf of beneficiaries.This bill would revise the definition of instrument under the Probate Code to mean a will, a document establishing or modifying a trust, a deed, or any other writing that designates a beneficiary or makes a donative transfer of property.
2230
2331 Existing law defines instrument for purposes of the Probate Code to mean a will, trust, deed, or other writing that designates a beneficiary or makes a donative transfer of property. Existing law, the Trust Law, regulates the creation, modification, and termination of trusts and the administration of trusts by trustees on behalf of beneficiaries.
2432
2533 This bill would revise the definition of instrument under the Probate Code to mean a will, a document establishing or modifying a trust, a deed, or any other writing that designates a beneficiary or makes a donative transfer of property.
2634
2735 ## Digest Key
2836
2937 ## Bill Text
3038
3139 The people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 45 of the Probate Code is amended to read:45. Instrument means a will, a document establishing or modifying a trust, a deed, or any other writing that designates a beneficiary or makes a donative transfer of property.
3240
3341 The people of the State of California do enact as follows:
3442
3543 ## The people of the State of California do enact as follows:
3644
3745 SECTION 1. Section 45 of the Probate Code is amended to read:45. Instrument means a will, a document establishing or modifying a trust, a deed, or any other writing that designates a beneficiary or makes a donative transfer of property.
3846
3947 SECTION 1. Section 45 of the Probate Code is amended to read:
4048
4149 ### SECTION 1.
4250
4351 45. Instrument means a will, a document establishing or modifying a trust, a deed, or any other writing that designates a beneficiary or makes a donative transfer of property.
4452
4553 45. Instrument means a will, a document establishing or modifying a trust, a deed, or any other writing that designates a beneficiary or makes a donative transfer of property.
4654
4755 45. Instrument means a will, a document establishing or modifying a trust, a deed, or any other writing that designates a beneficiary or makes a donative transfer of property.
4856
4957
5058
5159 45. Instrument means a will, a document establishing or modifying a trust, a deed, or any other writing that designates a beneficiary or makes a donative transfer of property.