|
09/05/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 248, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
09/05/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2019
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2246.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2019
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2726.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/10/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2019
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 956.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 903.) (May 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2019
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2019
|
April 24 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2019
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2019
|
April 10 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2019
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2019
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2019
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|