California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB355 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2019

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2019

Chaptered

Bill September 5, 2019

Amended

Bill July 10, 2019
Bill May 2, 2019