|
10/09/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 701, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/19/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2019
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2842.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2019
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 1. Page 3266.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2019
|
July 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 960.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2019
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2019
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2019
|
April 22 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2019
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 439.) (March 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2019
|
Set for hearing March 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2019
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2019
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|