California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB367 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 13, 2019

Chaptered

Bill October 9, 2019

Amended

Bill June 13, 2019
Bill April 22, 2019
Bill April 2, 2019