|
09/28/2020
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 228, Statutes of 2020.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2020
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2020
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2020
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5289.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2020
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2020
|
August 11 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/27/2020
|
August 3 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2020
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/27/2020
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3153.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2020
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3141.) (January 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2020
|
Set for hearing January 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2020
|
January 21 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2020
|
Set for hearing January 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/14/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3087.) (January 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2020
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2020
|
Set for hearing January 14 in PUB. S. pending receipt.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2019
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2019
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|