|
10/02/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 475, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
10/02/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/17/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2019
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2786.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2019
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2019
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3174.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/10/2019
|
July 10 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1246.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 1098.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2019
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2019
|
May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2019
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 796.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2019
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2019
|
April 10 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2019
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2019
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2019
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|