California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB390 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 12, 2019

Chaptered

Bill October 2, 2019

Amended

Bill June 20, 2019
Bill May 17, 2019
Bill May 1, 2019
Bill March 25, 2019