|
10/08/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 593, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/19/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2019
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 2890.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2019
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 46. Noes 14. Page 3433.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2019
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2019
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2019
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2019
|
June 11 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 2. Page 916.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 624.) (April 9).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2019
|
Set for hearing April 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2019
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|