California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB394 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 16, 2019

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2019

Amended

Bill August 22, 2019
Bill June 6, 2019
Bill April 3, 2019