|
10/13/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 869, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
10/13/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/19/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2019
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2890.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2019
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 63. Noes 5. Page 3435.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2019
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2019
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 1.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2019
|
August 21 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2019
|
Referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1275.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1098.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2019
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2019
|
May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2019
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 622.) (April 9).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2019
|
Set for hearing April 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2019
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2019
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|