California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB395 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 16, 2019

Chaptered

Bill October 13, 2019

Amended

Bill September 6, 2019
Bill July 3, 2019
Bill June 25, 2019
Bill April 29, 2019