|
07/30/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 136, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
07/30/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/19/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/11/2019
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2055.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2019
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2019
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2488.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 4).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 955.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 905.) (April 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2019
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/04/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/03/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|