California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB41 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 3, 2018

Enrolled

Bill July 15, 2019

Chaptered

Bill July 30, 2019

Amended

Bill June 10, 2019
Bill May 2, 2019