Assembly
|
07/08/2019
|
July 8 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 10. Page 1326.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1088.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2019
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2019
|
May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2019
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 845.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2019
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 383.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2019
|
Set for hearing March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on EQ. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/04/2018
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/03/2018
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|