California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB43 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 3, 2018

Amended

Bill July 1, 2019
Bill June 17, 2019
Bill May 21, 2019
Bill April 29, 2019
Bill April 22, 2019