|
09/27/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 371, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/17/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2019
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2610.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2019
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2019
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3046.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2019
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2019
|
August 21 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
Referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 921.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 749.) (April 22).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2019
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 523.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2019
|
Set for hearing April 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2019
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|