California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB449 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2019

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2019

Amended

Bill August 12, 2019
Bill May 28, 2019