|
10/09/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 703, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/19/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2019
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2868.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2019
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2019
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3336.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2019
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2019
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2019
|
August 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2019
|
July 1 hearing: Heard for testimony only.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2019
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1339.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1099.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2019
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2019
|
May 6 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2019
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 550.) (April 3).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2019
|
Set for hearing April 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2019
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2019
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|