California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB451 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 13, 2019

Chaptered

Bill October 9, 2019

Amended

Bill September 6, 2019
Bill September 3, 2019
Bill May 21, 2019
Bill April 8, 2019