Assembly
|
08/30/2019
|
August 30 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2019
|
August 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2019
|
(Received at desk July 10 pursuant to JR 61(a)(10)).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 21. Noes 0.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2019
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1276.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1100.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2019
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2019
|
May 6 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2019
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0. Page 772.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2019
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2019
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2019
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|