|
10/02/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 408, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
10/02/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/19/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2019
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 2. Page 2851.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2019
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 3. Page 3337.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2019
|
August 21 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2019
|
(Received at desk July 17 pursuant to JR 61(a)(10)).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2019
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2019
|
July 3 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2019
|
Referred to Com. on U. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2019
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1187.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 1102.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2019
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2019
|
May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2019
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2019
|
May 6 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2019
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 842.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2019
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2019
|
April 10 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2019
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2019
|
Referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2019
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2019
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|