California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB520 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 13, 2019

Chaptered

Bill October 2, 2019

Amended

Bill September 3, 2019
Bill August 13, 2019
Bill June 27, 2019
Bill April 11, 2019